RI S2816 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bases the composition of the Chariho Regional School on more recent population schedules.
Title
In Amendment Of And In Addition To Chapter 286 Of The Public Laws Of 1986, Entitled "authorizing The Towns Of Charlestown, Richmond And Hopkinton, To Join A Regional School District, Incorporating Said Regional School District, And Providing For The Issuance Of Bonds, Construction And Operation Of A Regional School For The Joint Use Of The Participating Towns, Within Said Regional School District Established By This Act, " As Amended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-09 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |