RI S2829 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the provisions of the law pertaining to subdivisions and zoning ordinances to provide for unified development review.
Title
Land Development And Subdivision Review--unified Development Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |