RI S2849 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- EXCAVATION NEAR UNDERGROUND UTILITY FACILITIES - Amends the provision of notice to be provided for the release of any hazardous gas or liquid as determined by the federal Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration.
Title
Amends the provision of notice to be provided for the release of any hazardous gas or liquid as determined by the federal Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-06 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-04 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2024) |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- EXCAVATION NEAR UNDERGROUND UTILITY FACILITIES
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- EXCAVATION NEAR UNDERGROUND UTILITY FACILITIES