RI S2855 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 To The Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (snap) Eat Well, Be Well Pilot Rewards Program (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To The Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (snap) Eat Well, Be Well Pilot Rewards Program.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF $5,000,000 TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL NUTRITION ASSISTANCE PROGRAM (SNAP) EAT WELL, BE WELL PILOT REWARDS PROGRAM (This resolution would authorize the appropriation of the sum of $5,000,000 to the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) Eat Well, Be Well Pilot Rewards Program.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2855.pdf |