RI S2857 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- LEVY AND ASSESSMENT OF LOCAL TAXES - Amends provisions relative to the levy and assessment of local taxes and would provide that the city of Providence may adopt a tax classification with unrestricted tax rates for certain classes of property.
Title
Amends provisions relative to the levy and assessment of local taxes and would provide that the city of Providence may adopt a tax classification with unrestricted tax rates for certain classes of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-21 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |