RI S2888 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting The Federal "race To The Top" Grant Program And Urging The Governor And The Rhode Island Department Of Elementary And Secondary Education To Submit A Competitive Application For The Race To The Top Round Two
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting The Federal "race To The Top" Grant Program And Urging The Governor And The Rhode Island Department Of Elementary And Secondary Education To Submit A Competitive Application For The Race To The Top Round Two
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Christopher Maselli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-04 | House passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-19 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-05-19 | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2888.pdf |