RI S2929 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC FINANCE -- RHODE ISLAND BABY BOND TRUST - Creates the Rhode Island baby bond trust to provide investment funds to children born to families with public health insurance or no insurance living in Rhode Island.
Title
Creates the Rhode Island baby bond trust to provide investment funds to children born to families with public health insurance or no insurance living in Rhode Island.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2929.pdf |