RI S2938 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- INDICTMENTS, INFORMATIONS AND COMPLAINTS - Includes the offense of second-degree sexual assault among the offenses to which there shall be no statute of limitations and provides for a ten (10) year statute of limitations for third-degree sexual assault.
Title
Includes the offense of second-degree sexual assault among the offenses to which there shall be no statute of limitations and provides for a ten (10) year statute of limitations for third-degree sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2938.pdf |