RI S2945 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- CONFIDENTIALITY OF HEALTH CARE COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION ACT - Amends provisions relative to confidentiality of health care communications and the process for requesting records and/or confidential health care information.
Title
Amends provisions relative to confidentiality of health care communications and the process for requesting records and/or confidential health care information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2024) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Businesses And Professions
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- CONFIDENTIALITY OF HEALTH CARE COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION ACT
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- CONFIDENTIALITY OF HEALTH CARE COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION ACT