RI S2966 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Provides a tax exemption to residents of the Town of Bristol who are over the age of sixty-five (65) years and who have continuously owned and resided in their primary residence in the town for at least twenty (20) years.
Title
Provides a tax exemption to residents of the Town of Bristol who are over the age of sixty-five (65) years and who have continuously owned and resided in their primary residence in the town for at least twenty (20) years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2966.pdf |