RI S2967 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Wildlife Rehabilitators Association of Rhode Island (Wildlife Clinic of Rhode Island), a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, located in North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Title
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Wildlife Rehabilitators Association of Rhode Island (Wildlife Clinic of Rhode Island), a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, located in North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-05-01 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |