RI S3041 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the statutory laws relating to driving under the influence and refusal to submit to chemical tests by adding the requirement for blood and/or urine testing.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |