RI S3041 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-31 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-31 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- DECISIONS, SPECIAL FINDINGS AND ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES - Adds the doctrine of assumption of risk to the current comparative negligence statute.
Title
Adds the doctrine of assumption of risk to the current comparative negligence statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- DECISIONS, SPECIAL FINDINGS AND ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- DECISIONS, SPECIAL FINDINGS AND ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES