RI S3044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation To Pay Certain Claims
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation To Pay Certain Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-11 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3044.pdf |