RI S3062 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Thomas R. Coderre to join Rhonda Smith and Mark T. Warren in marriage on or about August 27, 2016, within the City of Pawtucket, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-09 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/08/2016) |