RI S3120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ANIMALS AND ANIMAL HUSBANDRY -- DOGS - Permits the town council of the town of Hopkinton to enact ordinances which increase the fines pertaining to the violation of any dog ordinance.
Title
Permits the town council of the town of Hopkinton to enact ordinances which increase the fines pertaining to the violation of any dog ordinance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-11 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-08 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |