SC H3021 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Licensed Insurers Who Allow Benefits To Be Paid Directly To Participating Or Preferred Health Care Service Providers Shall Allow A Payment To A Similarly Licensed Nonparticipating Or Nonpreferred Health Care Service Provider.
Title
Licensed insurers
Sponsors
Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] |
Rep. James Burns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns |
2015-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3867 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3021&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3021_20141211.htm |