SC H3041 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Election Must Be Held On The Date Of A General Election Or On The Date Of A Primary Election.
Title
School bond election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2011-05-17 | Committed to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-17 | Recalled from Committee on Education | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-03-10 | Read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Amended | |
2011-03-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons | |
2011-03-09 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2011-01-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Patrick | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-07 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled |