SC H3070 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Certain Special Education Students May Obtain Occupational Credential Certificates Developed And Endorsed By The State Department Of Education, To Provide Certain Requirements For These Certificates, To Impose Certain Related Requirements On The Department And The State Board Of Education, To Provide These Provisions Do Not Provide Special Education Students With Additional Rights Beyond Those Specifically Guaranteed By Federal And State Law Or District Policy, And To Provide Participation In This Program By Districts Is Voluntary.
Title
Special education students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0442 (Similar To) 2017-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3070&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3070_20161215.htm |