SC H3070 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article V Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The Judicial Department, So As To Provide That Supreme Court Justices, Judges On The Court Of Appeals, And Circuit Court Judges Shall Be Appointed By The Governor With The Advice And Consent Of The General Assembly Rather Than Being Elected By The General Assembly, And To Repeal Provisions Requiring The General Assembly To Establish A Judicial Merit Screening Commission.
Title
Supreme Court judges, Court of Appeals judges, and Circuit Court judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2019-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0170 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3070&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3070_20181218.htm |