SC H3094 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 25, Title 59 So As To Enact The "teacher Bill Of Rights" And To Enumerate The Basic Rights To Which All Certified Public School Teachers In This State Are Entitled.
Title
Teacher Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Wooten [R] | Rep. Russell Ott [D] | Rep. Seth Rose [D] | Rep. JA Moore [D] |
Rep. Bobby Cox [R] | Rep. Doug Gilliam [R] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. William Cogswell [R] |
Rep. William Wheeler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0244 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4753 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4753 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3094&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3094_20181218.htm |