SC H3099 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "forming Open And Robust University Minds (forum) Act" By Adding Chapter 148 To Title 59 So As To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide Measures To Protect Expressions By Students And Student Organizations In Certain Places On The Campuses Of Public Institutions Of Higher Learning In This State, To Provide Related Requirements For Policies And Procedures, To Provide Specific Responsibilities Of Public Institutions Of Higher Learning, And To Provide Means Of Redress For Violations Of This Act.
Title
Forming Open and Robust University Minds (FORUM) Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2019-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4775 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
H4960 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
H4960 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3099&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3099_20181218.htm |