SC H3116 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Certain Persons Who Knowingly Solicit, Persuade, Encourage, Or Entice A Licensed Dealer Or Private Seller Of Firearms Or Ammunition In Violation Of State Or Federal Law, Or Knowingly Provide That Person With Materially False Information To Deceive Him About The Legality Of A Transfer Of A Firearm Or Ammunition, Or Wilfully Procure Another Person To Engage In Certain Illegal Activities Are Guilty Of A Felony, To Provide Penalties, And To Provide Certain Terms And Their Definitions That Relate To These Offenses.
Title
Firearms and ammunition
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Ralph Kennedy [R] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] |
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] |
Rep. Robert Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-26 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2015-03-25 | House | Read second time |
2015-03-25 | House | Amended |
2015-03-19 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-03-19 | House | Member |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2015-03-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Clemmons |
2015-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kennedy |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |