SC H3146 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Effective date 05/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Effective date 05/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Superintendent Of Education From The List Of State Officers Which The Constitution Requires To Be Elected And Provide That The Superintendent Of Education Must Be Appointed By The Governor, Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate, To Serve At The Pleasure Of The Governor Beginning In January 2023, Or Upon A Vacancy In The Office Of The Superintendent Of Education After The Date Of The Ratification Of This Amendment, Whichever Occurs First, And To Provide That The General Assembly Shall Provide By Law For The Duties, Compensation, And Qualifications For The Office
Title
Superintendent of Education, appointed by the Governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Res. To The Constitution (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Res. To The Constitution (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Effective date 05/14/18 | |
2018-05-14 | No signature required | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 235 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-6 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-26 Nays-6 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Polled out of committee Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-24 |
2017-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis |
2017-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2017-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2017-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, Loftis, Burns |
2017-02-01 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2017-01-31 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-1-17 |
2017-01-31 | House | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Clary, Hiott, Bamberg |
2017-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin |
2017-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | House | Member |
2017-01-11 | House | Member |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0137 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
H3036 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H3036 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary