SC H3177 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require A Candidate Seeking Elective Office To Be A Qualified Elector Of The District In Which He Is A Candidate For At Least Ninety Consecutive Days Prior To The First Day That Candidates May File For That Office.
Title
Candidate seeking elective office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss |
2013-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.S.McLeod |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2012-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3177&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3177_20121218.htm |