SC H3203 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Roll call Yeas-66 Nays-28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Roll call Yeas-66 Nays-28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Define The Term "utility Trailer" And To Provide For The Equipment That Must Be Used To Attach A Towing Vehicle To A Utility Trailer.
Title
Utility trailer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House: Commit The Bill (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 27 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit Bill (Y: 35 N: 67 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit Bill (Y: 35 N: 67 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-66 Nays-28 |
2015-04-29 | House | Committed to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2015-04-29 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-28-15 |
2015-04-22 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled |