SC H3257 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue United States Marine Corps Special License Plates.
Title
Special license plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-05-02 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-05-02 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time | |
2012-05-01 | Amended | |
2012-04-26 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-14 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2010-12-14 | Prefiled |