SC H3270 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Substitute The Term "statewide Accounting And Reporting System" For The Term "south Carolina Enterprise Information System".
Title
Comptroller General duties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2017-02-14 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3271 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 3 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 3 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 3 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 2 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 65 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 3 | 180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 148 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 171 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 2080 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 746 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 10 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 10 | 660 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 11 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 19 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 19 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 11450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 12610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 13010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 13310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 13610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 2545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 355 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3950 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 5400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 6000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 662 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7050 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7780 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7950 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2933 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2942 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2945 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2950 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2951 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 5670 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 750 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 9 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 27 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 5 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 101 | 185 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 143 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 15 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 3 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3270&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3270_20161215.htm |