SC H3277 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-7-20, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Terms Defined In The South Carolina Children's Code, So As To Incorporate "torture" Into The Definition Of "child Abuse Or Neglect" And To Define The Term; To Amend Section 63-7-1640, Relating In Part To The Right Of The Department Of Social Services To Forego Family Preservation And Reunification In The Case Of Torture, So As To Make Conforming Changes; To Amend Section 63-7-2570, Relating To Grounds For Termination Of Parental Rights, So As To Add Torture, Or Conspiring To Commit Torture, As A Ground For Terminating A Parent's Rights; To Amend Section 16-3-85, Relating To Homicide By Child Abuse, So As To Add Death Of A Child By Torture, Or By Conspiring To Torture, As Actions Constituting The Offense, And To Establish Criminal Penalties; By Adding Section 16-3-100 So As To Provide That Torturing A Child, Or Allowing Another To Torture A Child, Is A Criminal Offense, And To Establish Penalties; And For Other Purposes.
Title
Torture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson |
2019-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2019-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2019-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Long |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0189 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 3 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 85 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 2570 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3277&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3277_20181218.htm |