SC H3278 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 40-60-10, Relating To The South Carolina Real Estate Appraisers Board, So As To Modify The Composition Of The Board; By Amending Section 40-60-20, Relating To Definitions, So As To Add Definitions And Modify Existing Definitions; By Amending Sections 40-60-30, 40-60-31, And 40-60-33, All Relating To Real Estate Appraiser Licensure Requirements, So As To Modify Exemptions, Revise, And Provide Education Requirements And Acceptable Equivalencies For Apprentice Appraisers, And To Revise Requirements And Qualifications For Licensed Mass Appraisers; By Amending Section 40-60-34, Relating To Requirements Relating To Apprentice Appraisers And Appraiser Supervising Apprentices, So As To Revise Requirements; By Amending Section 40-60-35, Relating To Continuing Education Requirements, So As To Impose Reporting Requirements Upon Licensees; By Amending Section 40-60-36, Relating To The Approval Of Courses, Educational Providers, And Instructors, So As To Impose Reporting Requirements Upon Providers; By Amending Section 40-60-37, Relating To Reciprocal Applications From Appraisers From Other Jurisdictions, So As To Make A Technical Correction; By Amending Section 40-60-40, Relating To Required Appraiser Contact Information, So As To Include Email Addresses Of Licensees; By Amending Section 40-60-50, Relating To Application And License Fees, So As To Outline Requirements For Application; By Amending Section 40-60-70, Relating To The Code Of Ethics, So As To Require Appraisers To Conduct Themselves In Accordance With A Code Of Ethics As Established In The Uniform Standards Of Professional Appraisal Practice; By Amending Section 40-60-80, Relating To Investigation Of Complaints And Violations, So As To Allow The Board To Decline To Conduct An Investigation Under Certain Circumstances; By Amending Section 40-60-110, Relating To Grounds For Denying Licensure Or Taking Disciplinary Actions, So As To Remove References To Permits And To Provide Circumstances When Disciplinary Actions May Be Taken; By Amending Section 40-60-220, Relating To The Continuation Of Existing Licenses, So As To Reference People Credentialed In This State; By Amending Section 40-60-320, Relating To Definitions, So As To Revise The Definition Of Appraisal Panel; By Amending Section 40-60-330, Relating To Registration Requirements, So As To Revise Requirements Concerning Certain Financial Information; By Amending Section 40-60-340, Relating To Exclusions From Registration Requirements, So As To Require Regulation By The Office Of Comptroller General, Among Other Things; By Amending Section 40-60-350, Relating To Renewal Of Registrations, So As To Modify The Renewal Frequency; By Amending Section 40-60-360, Relating To Promulgation Of Regulations, So As To Specify Required Regulations; By Amending Section 40-60-370, Relating To Requirements For Owners Of Appraisal Management Companies, So As To Provide Circumstances In Which An Appraisal Management Company Shall Not Be Registered In This State Or Included On The National Registry; By Amending Section 40-60-400, Relating To Certification Or Licensure Required For Employees And Independent Contractors, So As To Include References To The Uniform Standards Of Professional Appraisals Practice Standards; By Amending Section 40-60-420, Relating To Record-keeping Requirements For Registration Renewal, So As To Revise Requirements Concerning Records That Appraisal Management Companies Must Provide; And By Amending Section 40-60-450, Relating To Compensation, So As To Clarify The Applicable Governing Federal Regulations. - Ratified Title
Title
Real estate appraisers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 196 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/21/24 | |
2024-05-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 204 | |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-115 Nays-0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Amended |
2024-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 60 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 36 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 60 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |