SC H3305 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 8-13-1343 So As To Prohibit A Member Of Or A Candidate For A Board Or Commission Elected Or Appointed By The General Assembly, Or A House Of It, From Making A Contribution To A Member Of The General Assembly, A Member Of The Candidate's Immediate Family, A Business, Or Individual With Whom He Is Associated, And To Make A Member Or Candidate Ineligible For Election Or Appointment Under Certain Conditions.
Title
Candidate contributions
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R] | Rep. William Cogswell [R] | Rep. Ronald Young [R] | Rep. Gary Clary [R] |
Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Bobby Cox [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. McLain Toole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2019-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2019-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, B.Cox |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Young, Clary |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3305&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3305_20181218.htm |