SC H3308 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 56-5-3910 So As To Provide That It Is Unlawful For A Driver Or Occupant Of A Motor Vehicle To Smoke A Tobacco Product While A Child Five Years Old Or Younger Is Also An Occupant Of The Motor Vehicle, And To Provide A Penalty.
Title
Smoking in car
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3315 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons
S0558 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
S0558 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3308&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3308_20181218.htm |