SC H3337 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Referred to Subcommittee: Goldfinch (ch), Johnson, Talley
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Referred to Subcommittee: Goldfinch (ch), Johnson, Talley
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Filing And Recording Fees Which May Be Charged, Including A Flat Fee Of Thirty-five Dollars For Certain Documents Filed Or Recorded With The Offices Of The Register Of Deeds Or Clerk Of Court, And A Flat Fee Of Ten Dollars For Certain Other Documents Filed Or Recorded With These Offices, And To Provide Exceptions.
Title
Filing and recording fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Goldfinch (ch), Johnson, Talley |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-02-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein, J.E.Smith |
2017-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |