SC H3361 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Make Conforming Changes Deleting References To Orders By The South Carolina Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals; And To Repeal Section 47-1-160 Relating To The Disposition Of Fines For Violations Of The Chapter Regarding Cruelty To Animals
Title
Domestic abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Act No. 251 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 292 | |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2014-06-03 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2014-06-03 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Allen, Hembree, Shealy, Young |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-68 Nays-39 |
2014-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2014-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.L.Brown |
2014-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 4 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |