SC H3407 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Roll call Yeas-60 Nays-59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Roll call Yeas-60 Nays-59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allow An Individual To Claim An Income Tax Credit Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 6, Chapter 63, Title 59.
Title
Educational Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider (Y: 61 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table Bill (Y: 60 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table Motion to Reconsider (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table bill (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table Bill (Y: 60 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table Motion to Reconsider (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Table bill (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Roll call Yeas-60 Nays-59 | |
2011-05-25 | Tabled | |
2011-05-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Edge, Bingham | |
2011-05-19 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, May 25, 2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means | |
2011-03-30 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brantley | |
2011-03-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas | |
2011-03-08 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Willis | |
2011-02-22 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tribble | |
2011-01-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Spires | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0414 (Similar To) 2011-01-20 - Referred to Committee on Education