SC H3408 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 23-31-600, Relating To Retired Personnel, Identification Cards, And Qualification For Carrying Concealed Weapons, So As To Delete The Provision That Restricts The Carrying Of Concealed Weapons Onto Certain Premises, And To Provide At No Charge, The State Law Enforcement Division Shall Issue Concealed Weapon Permits Under Certain Circumstances To Certain Holders Of Qualified Retired Law Enforcement Officer Credentials.
Title
Law enforcement officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0170 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3407 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
H5013 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
H3407 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
H5013 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3408&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3408_20221208.htm |