SC H3433 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Act No. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Act No. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Review And Rename Certain Voting Precincts Of Beaufort County And To Redesignate A Map Number For The Map On Which Lines Of These Precincts Are Delineated And Maintained By The Division Of Research And Statistics Of The State Budget And Control Board
Title
Voting precincts revised
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Act No. 232 | |
2012-06-20 | Effective date 06/18/12 | |
2012-06-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Ratified R 285 | |
2012-06-06 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-06 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2012-06-01 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-05-31 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-05-31 | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-31 | Read second time | |
2012-05-30 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-05-31 | Amended | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-04 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-02-03 | Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, February 3, 2011 | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |