SC H3472 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-31-240, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Persons Allowed To Carry A Concealable Weapon While On Duty, So As To Include The Attorney General And Assistant Attorneys General In The Purview Of The Statute.
Title
Concealed weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-01-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-31 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-01-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, Ligon, Clemmons, Anderson |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Pope, Bryant, Fry |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |