SC H3526 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-4)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardwick
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardwick
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING ARTICLE 5 TO CHAPTER 1, TITLE 1 SO AS TO ENACT THE "RIGHT TO LIFE ACT OF SOUTH CAROLINA" WHICH ESTABLISHES THAT THE RIGHT TO LIFE FOR EACH BORN AND PREBORN HUMAN BEING VESTS AT FERTILIZATION, AND THAT THE RIGHTS OF DUE PROCESS AND EQUAL PROTECTION, GUARANTEED BY ARTICLE I, SECTION 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THIS STATE, VEST AT FERTILIZATION FOR EACH BORN AND PREBORN HUMAN PERSON.
Title
Enact The "right To Life Act Of South Carolina" Which Establishes That The Right To Life For Each Born And Preborn Human Being Vests At Fertilization, And That The Rights Of Due Process And Equal Protection, Guaranteed By Article I, Section 3 Of The Constitution Of This State, Vest At Fertilization For Each Born And Preborn Human Person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardwick | |
2010-02-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haley | |
2009-02-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Umphlett, Cato | |
2009-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith, Millwood, Forrester | |
2009-02-18 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White | |
2009-02-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile, Simrill | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-14 | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced and read first time HJ-14 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3526&session=118 |