SC H3529 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Munnerlyn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Munnerlyn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Revisions To This Chapter Must Correspond With Guidelines Established By The Alliance For A Healthier Generation.
Title
Snack food for schools
Sponsors
Rep. Liston Barfield [R] | Rep. Joan Brady [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Munnerlyn [D] | Rep. Bakari Sellers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Munnerlyn | |
2012-01-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Barfield | |
2011-09-16 | Member(s) noted request to add name as sponsor: Barfield | |
2011-04-05 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brady, Butler Garrick | |
2011-03-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3214 (Similar To) 2011-02-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Butler Garrick
S0227 (Similar To) 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0452 (Similar To) 2011-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0498 (Similar To) 2011-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0227 (Similar To) 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0452 (Similar To) 2011-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0498 (Similar To) 2011-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 10 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3529&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3529_20110202.htm |