SC H3540 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Delete A Reference To The Eligibility Requirements Of Constitutional Officers, And To Authorize The Governor To Make A Temporary Appointment To The Office Of Adjutant General Pursuant To Section 1-3-210 Should A Vacancy Occur At A Time When The Senate Is Not In Session; And To Provide That The Above Provisions Are Effective Upon The Ratification Of Amendments To Section 7, Article Vi, And Section 4, Article Xiii Of The Constitution Of This State Deleting The Requirement That The State Adjutant General Be Elected By The Qualified Electors Of This State
Title
Removal of officers by the Governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Act No. 224 | |
2014-06-11 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2014-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 249 | |
2014-05-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2013-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart |
2013-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-2 |
2013-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2013-03-19 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2013-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Knight |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0445 (Similar To) 2013-03-12 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Sheheen, Hembree, McElveen, Young
S0466 (Similar To) 2013-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0466 (Similar To) 2013-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 3 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |