SC H3546 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 1-30-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Department Of Parks, Recreation And Tourism, So As To Establish Objectives For The South Carolina Film Commission.
Title
SC Film Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Chandra Dillard [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] |
Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] | Rep. Michael Rivers [D] | Rep. David Weeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 87 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-17 |
2021-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2021-03-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard, Bradley, Erickson, S.Williams, Rivers, Weeks |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |