SC H3566 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Law Enforcement Training Council Shall Develop Guidelines For A One-week Training Program Offered By The Criminal Justice Academy To School First Responders That Certifies Them To Possess Firearms On School Premises, And To Provide The Conditions Upon Which School First Responders May Possess Firearms On School Premises, And To Provide Funding To Create This Program.
Title
Law Enforcement Training Council
Sponsors
Rep. Phillip Lowe [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. Wallace Jordan [R] | Rep. Brian White [R] |
Rep. Joshua Putnam [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-8 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-05 | House | Amended |
2017-04-05 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17 |
2017-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |