SC H3587 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 13, Title 38 So As To Require An Insurer Or An Insurance Group To Submit A Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure And Establish Certain Requirements For The Disclosure, To Define Necessary Terms, To Authorize The Director Of The Department Of Insurance To Promulgate Regulations Related To The Disclosure, To Provide Certain Confidentiality Requirements For Information Submitted To The Director And To Prohibit The Director Or A Person Who Receives Information Related To The Annual Disclosure From Testifying In A Private Civil Action Concerning The Confidential Information, To Authorize The Director To Retain Third-party Consultants And Prescribe Certain Rules For The Consultants, To Provide A Penalty For An Insurer Who Fails To File The Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure, And To Set An Effective Date; By Adding Section 38-21-295 So As To Authorize The Director To Act As The Group-wide Supervisor For An Internationally Active Insurance Group Under Certain Circumstances, To Establish A Procedure For The Director To Determine Whether He May Act As The Group-wide Supervisor Or Acknowledge Another Regulatory Official To Act As The Group-wide Supervisor, To Authorize The Director To Engage In Certain Activities As Group-wide Supervisor, And To Authorize The Director To Promulgate Regulations; And To Amend Section 38-21-10, Relating To Insurance Holding Company Regulatory Act Definitions, So As To Define The Terms "director," "group-wide Supervisor," And "internationally Active Insurance Group".
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Amended |
2019-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: West |
2019-02-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0075 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Act No. 3