SC H3588 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Conference committee appointed Massey, Scott, Talley
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Conference committee appointed Massey, Scott, Talley
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-149-50, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Criteria For Life Scholarships, So As To Strengthen English, Mathematics, And Computer Science Foundations Of High School Seniors Seeking Life Scholarships By Requiring Successful Completion Of Certain English And Mathematics Or Computer Science Coursework During Their Senior Years, And To Exclude Members Of The 2022-2023 Senior Class From These Requirements.
Title
LIFE scholarships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 102 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Massey, Scott, Talley |
2022-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-102 |
2022-05-11 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-13 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-30 |
2021-04-08 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-8-21 |
2021-02-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-2-21 |
2021-02-18 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-23-21 |
2021-02-17 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |