SC H3601 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 16-17-530, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Public Disorderly Conduct, So As To Allow And Provide Procedures For Conditional Discharge For First-time Offenders. - Ratified Title
Title
Disorderly conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2a (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2a (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Act No. 90 | |
2019-07-09 | Effective date 06/25/19 | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Veto overridden Ayes-38 Nays-2 |
2019-06-25 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2019-05-28 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2019-05-22 | Ratified R 105 | |
2019-05-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2019-05-20 | House | Conference report adopted |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hembree, Talley, Bright Matthews |
2019-05-09 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Rose, McCoy, Pendarvis |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.B.Matthews (ch), Shealy, Senn |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Hutto, Sabb, Senn, Talley |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-28 | House | Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0610 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: M.B.Matthews (ch), Shealy, Senn