SC H3612 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "south Carolina Computer Science Education Initiative Act" By Adding Section 59-29-250 So As To Provide For The Expansion And Enhancement Of Computer Science Education In Public High Schools Through The Creation And Implementation Of A Statewide Computer Science Education Plan And The Requirement That Each Public School Offers At Least One Computer Science Course That Meets Certain Criteria.
Title
SC Computer Science Education Initiative Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-01-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-116 Nays-1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Amended |
2021-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Davis, Murray, Gilliard, Carter, Anderson, Weeks |
2021-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon |
2021-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |