SC H3614 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-39-105 So As To Provide High School Seniors Shall Complete And Submit A Free Application For Federal Student Aid Before Graduating From High School, To Provide Exemptions, To Provide Related Requirements For The Implementation Of These Provisions, And To Make These Provisions Applicable Beginning With The 2022-2023 School Year.
Title
Student aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-6 |
2021-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2021-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |