SC H3618 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Upon This Termination The Practice Of The Physician Assistant Must Cease Until New Scope Of Practice Guidelines, Rather Than A New Application, Are Submitted By A New Supervising Physician To The Board; And To Repeal Section 40-47-980 Relating To The Treatment Of Patients In Chronic Care And Long-term Care Facilities.
Title
Physician assistants
Sponsors
Rep. Kristopher Crawford [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] | Rep. William Whitmire [R] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] |
Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-25 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy |
2013-04-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0448 (Similar To) 2013-05-28 - Act No. 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 47 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 938 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 945 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 955 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 960 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 965 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 970 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 975 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 980 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 995 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |