SC H3641 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-6)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Young, Taylor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Young, Taylor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For A Biennial State Budget, And To Direct The Code Commissioner To Update Appropriately References To The Annual General Appropriations Bill And Act.
Title
Zero-base budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Young, Taylor | |
2011-02-23 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight | |
2011-02-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0280 (Similar To) 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 11 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 62 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 68 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 78 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |